Governing document THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR SEED SCIENCE
Charity number: 1081225

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 2000, AS AMENDED 12 MAY 2005 AND 12 JULY 2006. as amended on 29 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SCIENTIFIC STUDY OF SEEDS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.