Financial history THE EDGAR AND MARY TRAYLEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1081442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £14.34k £10.54k £15.50k £17.54k £14.40k
Total expenditure £14.53k £15.13k £16.52k £16.50k £15.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A