THE DEBENHAMS RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides services solely to pensioners of The Debenhams Group and receive funding from the group. The basic services are:- limited home visiting, help and advice, social activities, financial assistance and the provision of emergency telephones.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 February 2000: Standard registration
- 17 November 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- DRA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.66k | £86.91k | £40.60k | £40.67k | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.38k | £77.74k | £60.10k | £27.31k | £44.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 05 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 05 November 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF ANY MEMBER OR MEMBERS OF THE SPECIFIED CLASS (AS DEFINED IN SUB-CLAUSE 3.2) CAUSED BY:- A) THE DEATH OF ANY OTHER SUCH MEMBER B) THE RETIREMENT FROM EMPLOYMENT BY ANY DEBENHAMS GROUP COMPANY OF ANY OTHER SUCH MEMBER C) THE ILLNESS OF ANY SUCH MEMBER OR D) ANY OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES ADVERSELY AFFECTING ANY SUCH MEMBER (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window