THE SOCIETY OF LOCAL AUTHORITY CHIEF EXECUTIVES AND SENIOR MANAGERS (SOLACE GROUP) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's aims focus on supporting social welfare through promoting efficiency and good practice in local government. Activities include: development and training for public service leaders; influencing public service policy debates based on membership expertise; building the integrity and reputation of public service management; supporting local public service leadership recruitment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£11,274,168
Donations and legacies | £2.00k | |
Charitable activities | £3.28m | |
Other trading activities | £7.96m | |
Investments | £24.42k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£11,333,677
Raising funds | £7.39m | |
Charitable activities | £3.94m | |
Other | £0 |
£11,900 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,023,550 from 332 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £7.39m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.94m |
People

51 Employee(s)
21 Trustee(s)
88 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 January 2001: Standard registration
- THE SOLACE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin John Tuddenham | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ruth O'Dwyer | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean Patrick Hanson | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elliott | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Garner | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Kate Doe | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Mary Kathleen Marjoram | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Katharine Hall | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Annette Louise McKoy | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Geoffrey Sarson Weaver | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adele Joanne Steven | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Evonne Rogers | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lucille Roney | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Adam Mark Hill | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Ruth Elizabeth Hyde | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nazeya Hussain-Duke | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Burns | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Renato Frainer | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Naylor | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Howard Fitzgerald | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Graeme Victor McDonald | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.55m | £7.41m | £8.21m | £10.61m | £11.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.40m | £7.14m | £8.12m | £10.61m | £11.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £528.84k | £549.42k | £900.02k | £807.47k | £1.02m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.49k | £528 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.70m | £5.58m | £6.06m | £0 | £7.96m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.84m | £1.79m | £2.15m | £2.45m | £3.28m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.34k | £3.15k | £2.27k | £5.91k | £24.42k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £35.49k | £528 | £8.15m | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.26m | £2.01m | £2.55m | £3.24m | £3.94m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.14m | £5.12m | £5.56m | £7.37m | £7.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £39.59k | £28.92k | £28.55k | £46.18k | £60.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £2.17k | £2.26k | £2.42k | £2.35k | £2.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £159.59k | £189.56k | £148.27k | £105.88k | £156.66k | |
|
Long-term investments | £114.46k | £155.99k | £158.55k | £145.29k | £157.50k | |
|
Other assets | £2.90m | £3.12m | £3.33m | £3.56m | £3.65m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.78m | £1.75m | £1.83m | £2.02m | £2.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/02/2015 as amended on 28 Sep 2018 as amended on 17 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH, THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC WORKS AND SERVICES AND PUBLIC AMENITIES AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER RELEASER TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF EFFICIENCY AND GOOD PRACTICE IN LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GROUND FLOOR
2 RED HALL COURT
WAKEFIELD
WEST YORKSHIRE
WF1 2UN
- Phone:
- 02072330081
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window