Accounts and annual returns INFORMATION SERVICES TRAINING ORGANISATION

Charity Number: 1080556
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 20 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 19 July 2006 169 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 06 May 2005 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 06 May 2005 95 days late