Financial history PICKER INSTITUTE EUROPE

Charity Number: 1081688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.67m £3.30m £4.06m £4.41m £5.21m
Total expenditure £3.89m £3.16m £3.58m £4.07m £4.81m
Income from government contracts £740.09k £890.99k £945.72k £1.08m £2.98m
Income from government grants £712.57k £531.92k £535.87k £531.56k £1.12m
Income - Donations and legacies £11.00k £123.00k £32.00k £8.00k £7.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £279.00k £437.00k £437.00k
Income - Charitable activities £3.65m £3.18m £3.75m £3.96m £4.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.00k £1.00k £0 £7.00k £17.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.89m £3.16m £3.34m £3.76m £4.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £18.00k £12.00k £39.00k £40.00k £30.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £245.00k £306.00k £390.00k