Governing document PICKER INSTITUTE EUROPE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/05/2004 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/03/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/04/2014
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR BY IMPROVING STANDARDS OF TREATMENT AND CARE FOR PATIENTS OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES; 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HEALTH CARE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS IN COMMUNICATION SKILLS; AND 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HEALTH CARE IN PARTICULAR BY DEVELOPING RESEARCH TOOLS AND UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO PATIENTS' PERSPECTIVES OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THE SAME FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.