Financial history MUSLIM BURIAL COUNCIL OF LEICESTERSHIRE

Charity number: 1087143
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £45.93k £54.07k £39.28k £26.43k £34.65k
Total expenditure £47.54k £49.32k £43.84k £36.23k £26.51k
Income from government contracts £40.47k N/A £20.24k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.50k