WILMCOTE VILLAGE HALL AND YOUTH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting in the running of, and the fundraising for, maintenance of Wilmcote Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 25 June 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Wood | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Debra Fairbrother | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Patricia Shakespeare | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Michael Alan Williams | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Louise Lorimer | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tina Jane Young | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sally Marshall | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Marshall | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Diana Christine Sykes | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY JAYNE DEACON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hugh Metford Frost | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.47k | £23.05k | £16.02k | £13.13k | £18.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.89k | £13.20k | £15.82k | £14.62k | £20.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £600 | £10.00k | £10.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 MAY 2001
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WILMCOTE IN THE COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WILMCOTE, WARWICKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINTERDYNE
BILLESLEY ROAD
WILMCOTE
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 9XG
- Phone:
- 01789296081
- Email:
- ldeacon76@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window