Trustees WILMCOTE VILLAGE HALL AND YOUTH CENTRE
Charity number: 1087155

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Wood | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Debra Fairbrother | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Patricia Shakespeare | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Michael Alan Williams | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Louise Lorimer | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tina Jane Young | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sally Marshall | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Marshall | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Diana Christine Sykes | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY JAYNE DEACON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hugh Metford Frost | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.