Financial history DROITWICH SPA AND RURAL COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity number: 1080042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £299.63k £352.00k £494.14k £270.14k £257.51k
Total expenditure £210.99k £213.49k £265.61k £318.30k £269.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.91k £169.31k £150.94k £107.32k £79.30k