DROITWICH SPA AND RURAL COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Infastructure Support Community Transport Community Building
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £79,296 from 11 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 28 March 2000: Standard registration
- DROITWICH CVS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Radcliffe | Chair | 08 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard Morris | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Richardson | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.63k | £352.00k | £494.14k | £270.14k | £257.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.99k | £213.49k | £265.61k | £318.30k | £269.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.91k | £169.31k | £150.94k | £107.32k | £79.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 21 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS: AND (II) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATUTORY BODIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN DROITWICH TOWN
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD LIBRARY CENTRE
65 OMBERSLEY STREET EAST
DROITWICH SPA
WORCESTERSHIRE
WR9 8QS
- Phone:
- 01905779115
- Email:
- admin@droitwichcvs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window