Financial history FLAGS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1085016
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011
Total gross income £0 £0 £1.33k £142 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £459 £623 £624
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A