FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S C. OF E. INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School events eg Easter and Christmas Fetes, disco and quiz nights, to raise funds for the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 26 April 2000: Standard registration
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 October 2012: Re-registered
- FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Celina Anderson | Chair | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Ball | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tara Lister | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Tooke | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.81k | £2.97k | £4.29k | £6.51k | £6.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.40k | £3.11k | £4.26k | £7.43k | £5.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 2000,AS AMENDED ON 4TH JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harborne Local Authority
St. Peter C Of E School
Old Church Road
Harborne
BIRMINGHAM
B17 0BE
- Phone:
- 07540258142
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window