AMBERSWOOD ENVIROMENTAL SERVICES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We recycle textiles, bric-a-brac, furniture etc and in so doing provide work experience and education for people with severe learning difficulties. We also do small house clearnces
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wigan
Governance
- 26 May 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS BROCKLEHURST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FREDERICK GLEAVES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.75k | £0 | £55.87k | £58.08k | £52.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.42k | £54.35k | £52.05k | £58.32k | £53.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 AUGUST 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 AUGUST 2000 AND 26 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LEARNING DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR OCCUPATIONAL TRAINING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE OPERATION OF A RECYCLING PROJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- 01942700091
- Email:
- amberswood34@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window