LEARNING LINK (GHANA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION- Sponsor pupils from financially poor families by offering busuries to enable them attend school, an important life building block, which they will/might otherwise be denied.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ghana
Governance
- 29 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLADYS NKANSA-DWAMENA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Magdalene Apenteng | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
EUGENE FRANCIS NKANSA-DWAMENA | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Frank NKANSA-DWAMENA | Trustee | 12 October 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £432 | £11 | £16 | £11 | £19 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN GHANA, WEST AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE AVAILABLE (11) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TEACHER TRAINING PROGRAMMES AND (111) CREATING A SCHOLARSHIP AND BURSARY FUND, TO BE NAMED THE NANA NKANSA-DWAMENA FUND, TO BE AWARDED TO CHILDREN IN FINANCIAL NEED TO ASSIST IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THEIR STUDIES.
Area of benefit
GHANA, WEST AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Tenby Avenue
HARROW
Middlesex
HA3 8RU
- Phone:
- 02089073822
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window