Financial history REDR UK

Charity Number: 1079752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.68m £1.34m £1.34m £1.72m £1.65m
Total expenditure £2.42m £1.42m £1.34m £1.68m £1.78m
Income from government contracts £27.20k £39.70k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £527.12k £312.23k £375.02k £398.88k £207.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.14m £1.02m £961.89k £1.31m £1.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.73k £3.61k £3.88k £3.95k £3.19k
Income - Other £0 £2.76k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £9.82k £100 £650 £17.20k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.98m £1.22m £1.11m £1.37m £1.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £437.41k £194.21k £231.02k £309.69k £332.63k
Expenditure - Governance £25.83k £41.27k £49.32k £0 £7.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0