THE SARON CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian Fellowship that meet to hear the Word of God and to study it. We give donations to various Christian Ministries to further the spread and understanding of the teachings of the Holy Bible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 02 November 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH MILSOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET MARGARET WING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARY ROWETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.93k | £950 | £6.15k | £14.43k | £4.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.83k | £2.27k | £5.09k | £4.36k | £8.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 1 OCTOBER 2000.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CARDIFF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
107 HEOL CASTELL COETY
BRIDGEND
CF31 1PX
- Phone:
- 01656662682
- Email:
- g7.rowett@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window