Financial history STREET (UK) FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1081902
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.04m £2.60m £1.37m £782.68k £137.20k
Total expenditure £2.75m £2.10m £1.72m £1.30m £979.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £101.93k £39.65k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £44 £325.46k £150.65k £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £1.17m £1.26m £520.25k £203.12k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.84m £1.01m £698.65k £574.66k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £26.87k £2.80k £522 £4.89k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.15m £1.50m £1.26m £1.05m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £601.38k £600.75k £466.41k £249.32k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £41.53k £26.84k £19.59k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A