STRATFORD-ON-AVON MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the understanding and appreciation of the arts through the promotion of arts events in the Stratford on Avon and surrounding districts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 31 March 2003: Standard registration
- STRATFORD ON AVON MUSIC FESTIVAL (Working name)
- STRATFORD-ON-AVON MUSIC FESTIVALS (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Jane Wilson | Chair | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Peter Hurst | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Simon Fiddian Birtles | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Susan Louise Murphy | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
David Ian Alabaster | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Timothy Charles Raistrick | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
JOHN WILLIAM EWART LIGGINS | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.18k | £22.94k | £26.66k | £29.20k | £6.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.22k | £29.30k | £32.93k | £27.20k | £1.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 OCTOBER 2002 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF ARTS EVENTS IN THE STRATFORD-ON-AVON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Area of benefit
STRATFORD-ON-AVON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Grove Road
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 6PB
- Phone:
- 01789 509885
- Email:
- STRATMUSICFEST@BTCONNECT.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window