COMMUNITY OF REFUGEES FROM VIETNAM - EAST LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CRV - East London provides following services: Vietnamese Elderly Support Services includes Drop in centre, advisory and information on welfare, housing, health, education, training, counselling and home visits. Luncheon club. Social cultural events and outing trips. Home care services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £104,432 from 2 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 10 April 2000: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY OF REFUGEES FROM VIETNAM-EAST LONDON (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YAN JI SHIEH OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PHUONG ANH HO | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
TUYET THANH LUONG | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
QUYEN BANH | Trustee |
|
||||||
KIET MY LY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHU MINH DUC NGUYEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
QUAN MINH DUC NGUYEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BICH THI NGUYEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.93k | £194.73k | £133.39k | £106.55k | £123.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.27k | £107.62k | £119.75k | £122.59k | £145.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £135.32k | N/A | £32.73k | £104.43k | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.58k | £23.00k | £54.97k | £42.97k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN THE VIETNAMESE COMMUNITY IN EAST LONDON WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; TO PROVIDE SERVICES THAT WILL IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE VIETNAMESE COMMUNITY IN EAST LONDON; TO ASSIST THE COMMUNITY TO INTEGRATE INTO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE COMMON GOOD; TO ADVANCE LEARNING IN THE COMMUNITY AND TO INTERACT WITH COMMUNITIES IN THE UK WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE TRADITIONAL VIETNAMESE CULTURE.
Area of benefit
EAST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Poplar Library - Unit 17
45 Gillender Street
LONDON
E14 6RN
- Phone:
- 02075384986
- Email:
- crveastlondon@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window