THE OXMOOR COMMUNITY ACTION GROUP ( OCAG )

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MOOR IN BLOOM ENTRY IN ANGLIA IN BLOOM - REGIONAL, BRITAIN IN BLOOM - NATIONAL 'URBAN COMMUNITY' ANNUAL FIREWORK DISPLAY - COMMUNITY ACTIVITY COMMUNITY ALLOTMENTS - GROW YOUR OWN 'HEALTHY EATING' COMMUNITY REPORTERS - BUILDING COMMUNICATION, LEARNING NEW SKILLS, REDUCE EXCLUSION. GRANT: NATIONAL LOTTERY AWARDS FOR ALL CANEWS MOORNEWS - BI MONTHLY NEWSPAPER X 6K HOMES. GRANT URBAN & CIVIC
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 31 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLLR ANN ELIZABETH BEEVOR | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JAMES MACKENDER-LAWRENCE | Trustee | 17 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.47k | £1.57k | £3.90k | £7.33k | £7.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.29k | £1.34k | £2.52k | £6.45k | £6.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION, ADOPTED 29/11/99, AS AMENDED 05/05/00
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELLBEING OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDENT IN THE OXMOOR AREA OD HUNTINGDON AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS, BY ASSOCIATING THE RELEVANT STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, BUSINESSES AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO: (1) ADVANCE EDUCATION; (2) PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH, AND TO RELIEVE SICKNESS; (3) MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, OR PROVIDE PUBLIC AMENITIES; (4) RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; (5) PROTECT, AND TO ASSIST IN THE PROTECTION OF, LIFE AND PROPERTY; (6) PROMOTE, AND PROVIDE FOR, THE CARE UPBRINGING AND ESTABLISHMENT IN LIFE, OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED OF SUCH SERVICES; AND (7) PROVIDE, AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS OF THE SAID COMMUNITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
OXMOOR, HUNTINGDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 ST. MARYS GREEN
WARBOYS
HUNTINGDON
PE28 2RS
- Phone:
- 07886389134
- Email:
- OCAG.NoW@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window