Financial history THE SUMATRAN TIGER TRUST

Charity number: 1082186
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £50.09k £110 £185 £2 £1.77k
Total expenditure £0 £50.00k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A