ADHD NORTH WEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helpline, information, advice and support for individuals and families affected by ADHD and associated conditions throughout the north west. Outreach support, workshops and programmes for parents (predominantly but not exclusively within Lancashire). Information, advice, and training for professionals/support workers. Multi-agency working groups, lectures and conferences
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Blackpool
- Bolton
- Bury
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Wigan
Governance
- 15 August 2000: Standard registration
- ADHD NORTH WEST REGIONAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frederick Attwater | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Maria Marco | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.14k | £160.84k | £127.44k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.14k | £112.07k | £176.21k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £127.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/06/99 AND AMENDED 29/07/2000 AND 20 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ATTENTION DEFICIT DISORDERS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY- (A)RAISING AWARENESS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC REGARDING ATTENTION DEFICIT DISORDERS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS, (B)THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR INFORMATION,SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF SUCH PERSONS AND, (C)BY ANY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 4, The Chambers
Old Town Hall Building
Town Hall Square
Great Harwood
BLACKBURN
BB6 7DD
- Phone:
- 01254 886886
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window