HEADWAY LUTON LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting people with an acquired brain injury and other neurological conditions, their family members and/or carers living in Luton and South Central Bedfordshire by providing holistic community support and day centre services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £21,200 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 18 May 2000: Standard registration
- HEADWAY SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivienne Headley | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Harvey | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Morgan | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Asif Malik | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DACOSTA HEADLEY | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN HENRY BATESON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £451.88k | £441.77k | £430.17k | £411.37k | £441.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £450.60k | £415.93k | £431.10k | £415.48k | £421.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.00k | £132.03k | £69.57k | N/A | £21.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/02/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/04/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/04/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF ADULTS WHO HAVE AN ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY AND/OR ANY OTHER NEUROLOGICAL CONDITION, THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS AND OTHER RELATED PROFESSIONALS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, SERVICES AND FACILITIES AS ARE REQUIRED BY SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Headway Luton Ltd
Link House
49-53 Alma Street
Luton
LU1 2PL
- Phone:
- 01582800242
- Email:
- enquiries@headwayluton.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window