Financial history CHIMPANZEE REHABILITATION TRUST

Charity number: 1081151
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £2.63k £152.79k £5.43k £54.05k £2.72k
Total expenditure £43.31k £12 £6.86k £49.54k £526
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A