ITALIAN MINISTRIES UK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports the networking of interdenominational Christian workers in Italy and raises awareness of the needs of Italy among churches in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Italy
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 March 2000: Standard registration
- ITALIAN MINISTRIES (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN DEMETRIUS GILMORE | Chair | 12 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
ROSINA GIBSON | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gavino Fioretti | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW GIBSON | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID COURT | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.22k | £4.90k | £13.42k | £6.31k | £7.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £424 | £100 | £13.45k | £6.06k | £7.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN ITALY, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF EUROPE OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. B) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN ITALY, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF EUROPE OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
ITALY, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF EUROPE OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Via G Pitre 174B
90135 PALERMO
Sicily
- Phone:
- 00393286518234
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window