AMAZING GRACE CHRISTIAN SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity is training the youths to take up challenges which will be of help immensely in their future roles. We as a charity are providing care for the needy and help other charitable organisations in terms of financial support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Hackney
- Havering
- Nigeria
Governance
- 09 May 2000: Standard registration
- CAC-AGC (Working name)
- CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH ( AMAZING GRACE CENTRE ) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ISRAEL OLADELE OBEMBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alan Olatunbosun | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olatunde Adebola Adeyemi | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lilly Dupe Ogundiran | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
EVANGELIST RACHEL OLUREMI OLUMOROTI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADEFOLARIN OLUMOROTI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.67k | £63.19k | £64.23k | £70.11k | £85.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.34k | £54.34k | £62.21k | £68.90k | £79.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29/02/2000 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/2012
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND PROCLAIMING THE KINGDOM OF GOD THROUGH THE PREACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD, THROUGH JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD. (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING CARE FOR THE NEEDY AND BY CO-OPERATING WITH OTHER CHARITABLE AND CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS TO OFFER HELP, BOTH FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE, TO VICTIMS OF WAR, DISASTER AND OTHER MISFORTUNE LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LA Ellis & Co Ltd
Unit 2
Dominion Works
Freshwater Road
DAGENHAM
Essex
- Phone:
- 02085923790
- Email:
- agc_cac@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window