FRIENDS OF CLINTON PRIMARY SCHOOL ORCHESTRA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, improve, develop, maintain and advance education in music and in particular but not exclusively in the provision of orchestra music for all within Clinton Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 07 July 2000: Standard registration
- 04 May 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 04 May 2019: Funds transferred to 510026 TEEM Clinton
- CHIME (Working name)
- CLINTON HELPING IMPROVE MUSICAL EDUCATION (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF C.P.S.O (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.90k | £5.03k | £2.55k | £4.04k | £4.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.35k | £4.66k | £848 | £1.47k | £3.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 17 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 03 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 03 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 8 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP, MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ORCHESTRA MUSIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window