THE HEATHER PREEN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise awareness of E coli. To provide educative information to children, parents and professionals relating to E coli. To raise funding for medical research into improving identification treatment and potential cures for E coli poisoning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 May 2000: Standard registration
- 26 February 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HEATHER'S TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 11 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 11 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 02 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 07 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/02/00
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND WORKERS IN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION ABOUT THE E.COLI BACTERIUM AND TO PROMOTE THE EXPEDIENT IDENTIFICATION OF THE BACTERIUM,ITS CAUSE,TREATMENT AND PREVENTION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window