WOLVERHAMPTON VOLUNTEER BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 17 March 2000: Standard registration
- 12 June 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- VOLUNTEER CENTRE WOLVERHAMPTON (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.40k | £29.00k | £118.24k | £94.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.92k | £107.00k | £124.04k | £130.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING, TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND OLD AGE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window