SHEFFIELD OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH ADVISORY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the organisation is to prevent and alleviate the effects of occupational disease and injury, to enable those with limiting health problems to work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £152,288 from 2 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 March 2001: Standard registration
- S.O.H.A.S. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ibthesam Mohsin Obaid | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dilan Ekong Tsafack | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Haksathul Nazreen Sainudeen Marikkar Mohamed Shakeek | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fahiim Osman | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Creed | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Hambleton | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PATRICK BOYCE BUDGEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE MARGARET GILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.94k | £159.13k | £156.83k | £172.42k | £191.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.55k | £148.26k | £159.19k | £155.92k | £190.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £138.24k | £172.42k | £152.29k | |
|
Income from government grants | £147.94k | £149.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 OCTOBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 22 JANUARY 2000 AND 28 SEPTEMBER 2000. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO HEALTH AND SAFETY AT WORK AND THE CAUSES OF WORK RELATED DISEASE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND; 3.2 TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN THEIR PAST AND PRESENT PLACES OF WORK AND PEOPLE WHO MAY BE AFFECTED BY THE ACTIVITIES OF COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY AND TO OFFER SERVICES TO COMBAT THE ILL EFFECTS OF WORK -RELATED DISEASE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOHAS
The Circle
33 Rockingham Lane
Sheffield City Centre
S1 4FW
- Phone:
- 01142755760
- Email:
- sohas@sohas.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window