THE BOURNEMOUTH JAMEI MOSQUE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.Providing a place of worship of Muslim faith 2. Teaching children about the Muslim faith 3. Community centre for social and religious activities 4. Continually look at ways of improving services to community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
Governance
- 29 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL HANNAN | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Shamsul Rahman | Trustee | 17 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sorforaj Alom Khan | Trustee | 17 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.33k | £26.86k | £30.47k | £47.06k | £44.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.14k | £18.33k | £19.45k | £36.50k | £31.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1286 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1286 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1651 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1651 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE MOSQUE AND TO PROMOTE THE MUSLIM FAITH BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING THE MOSQUE FOR THE WORSHIP OF THE MUSLIM FAITH AND THE DUE PERFORMANCE OF THE RITES OF MARRIAGE AND BURIAL ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE MUSLIM FAITH 2) MAINTAINING AND PROVIDING A RESIDENCE FR AN IMAM 3) TEACHING AND EDUCATING CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN THE DOCTRINES AND PRACTICES OF THE MUSLIM FAITH 4) PROVIDING INSTRUCTION IN THE ARABIC AND BENGALI LANGUAGES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Vicarage Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH9 2SA
- Phone:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window