NEW ERA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the benefit of the residents of the administrative Borough of Hyndburn, byassociating the local authorites, voluntary organisations and residents of the Borough in a common effort to advance education relieve poverty and to provide facilities in the interest of social welfare, for recreation and leisure timeoccupation with the aim of improving the conditions of life for the said residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 29 May 2002: Standard registration
- 09 November 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NEW ERA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.67k | £216.53k | £28 | £16 | £12 | |
|
Total expenditure | £245.08k | £219.48k | £23.03k | £8.11k | £6.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 18 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 12 April 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 14 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 21 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 08 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 08 October 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 9 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE BOROUGH OF HYNDBURN, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND RESIDENTS OF THE BOROUGH IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH AIM OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
ACCRINGTON HYNDBURN LANCASHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window