Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE DRESDEN ASSISTANCE FUND IN CONNECTION WITH QUEEN CHARLOTTE'S MATERNITY HOSPITAL
Charity number: 237791-21
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED 2 FEBRUARY 1904 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 3 OCTOBER 1969 DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2000 AND OGL DATED 28 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT AND ASSISTANCE ON THEIR DISCHARGE OF NEEDY AND DESERVING IN-PATIENTS OF ANY HOSPITAL FROM TIME TO TIME COMPRISED IN THE GROUP OF HOSPITALS UNDER THE MANAGEMENT OF THE HAMMERSMITH HOSPITALS NHS TRUST. THE AMOUNT OF ASSISTANCE TO BE GIVEN TO EACH BENEFICIARY SHALL NOT EXCEED TEN PER CENT OF THE NET INCOME OF THE CHARITY GENERATED IN THE PREVIOUS FINANCIAL YEAR. IF NOT REQUIRED AS AFORESAID THE INCOME MAY BE APPLIED FOR ASSISTING IN CASES OF NEED PATIENTS WHO ARE RECEIVING TREATMENT AT ANY HOSPITALS IN THE SAID GROUP
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 14 March 2000: Standard registration
- 20 July 2001: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 July 2001: Funds transferred to 1059138-26 THE DRESDEN ASSISTANCE FUND IN CONNECTION WITH QUE...
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.