Education Saves Lives

Charity number: 1080131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Publishing interactive DVDs on HIV and AIDS, child care, health and life skills.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £61,022
Total expenditure: £122,010

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire
  • Afghanistan
  • Bangladesh
  • Botswana
  • Brazil
  • Bulgaria
  • Burma
  • Burundi
  • Cambodia
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Ethiopia
  • France
  • Ghana
  • India
  • Iran
  • Jordan
  • Kenya
  • Lesotho
  • Liberia
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Morocco
  • Mozambique
  • Nepal
  • Nigeria
  • Pakistan
  • Philippines
  • Romania
  • Rwanda
  • Sierra Leone
  • South Africa
  • South Sudan
  • Sri Lanka
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • Togo
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Uganda
  • United States
  • Vietnam
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 March 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • Thare Machi Education (TME) (Working name)
  • THARE MACHI THE STARFISH INITIATIVE (Working name)
  • Education Saves Lives (Previous name)
  • THARE MACHI LTD (Previous name)
  • THARE MACHI THE STARFISH INTIATIVE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jyotsna Jagmohan Chandrani Trustee 22 November 2023
Canopi Foundation
Received: On time
Canopi Foundation 1
Received: On time
Canopi Foundation 2
Received: On time
Stuart Phillip Dawson Trustee 09 February 2022
Canopi Foundation
Received: On time
Canopi Foundation 1
Received: On time
Canopi Foundation 2
Received: On time
Matthew James Sampson Trustee 20 July 2020
Canopi Foundation
Received: On time
Canopi Foundation 1
Received: On time
Canopi Foundation 2
Received: On time
Russell Holmes Thompson Trustee 19 February 2020
Canopi Foundation
Received: On time
Canopi Foundation 1
Received: On time
Canopi Foundation 2
Received: On time
Miles Nicholas Donohoe Trustee 21 August 2019
Canopi Foundation
Received: On time
Canopi Foundation 1
Received: On time
Canopi Foundation 2
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.56k £25.22k £117.86k £13.51k £61.02k
Total expenditure £52.74k £55.72k £93.89k £126.69k £122.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.43k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Education Saves Lives
PO Box 4040
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV32 5YJ
Phone:
01926 422711