HIGH WYCOMBE & DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a free independent advice service to people in the High Wycombe area. Working to influence the development of services and policies at local and national levels.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 31 March 2000: Standard registration
- 26 August 2015: Funds received from 803422 WYCOMBE DISTRICT RACIAL EQUALITY COUNCIL
- 01 February 2019: Funds received from 1022277 FRIENDS OF HIGH WYCOMBE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- 09 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1126825 CITIZENS ADVICE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE LTD
- 09 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1081138 CHILTERN CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LIMITED
- 09 January 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £342.23k | £411.14k | £515.79k | £627.83k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £394.64k | £392.46k | £511.25k | £597.04k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £154.48k | £166.67k | £203.28k | £157.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £3.50k | £1.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £508.17k | £622.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £4.13k | £3.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £482.13k | £567.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £29.11k | £29.09k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | £5.54k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 23RD FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 DEC 2005 as amended on 05 Dec 2013 as amended on 08 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
The Charity's objects are to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in High Wycombe & District and the surrounding areas.
Area of benefit
HIGH WYCOMBE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window