Financial history MONMOUTHSHIRE BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1081311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £61.64k £88 £40.00k £50.00k £51.87k
Total expenditure £35.11k £16.57k £28.00k £36.94k £48.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A