MONMOUTHSHIRE BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation makes donations to local organisations and groups and will not consider applications to support an individuals activities. The Foundation is happy to receive applications from all walks of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Blaenau Gwent
- Bridgend
- Caerphilly
- City Of Swansea
- Monmouthshire
- Neath Port Talbot
- Newport City
- Torfaen
Governance
- 28 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Sumsion | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kristy Maloney | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Dawn Gunter | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.64k | £88 | £40.00k | £50.00k | £51.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.11k | £16.57k | £28.00k | £36.94k | £48.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JUNE 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE FOUNDATION ("THE TRUSTEES") SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.IN PRACTICE NEWPORT, SOUTH WALES MONMOUTHSHIRE, TORFAEN, CAERPHILLY, BLAENAU GWENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Monmouthshire Bldg Soc
13 John Frost Square
NEWPORT
NP20 1PX
- Phone:
- 01633844411
- Email:
- mbscf@monbs.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window