THE FRIENDS OF BRIDGE END GARDENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Bridge End Gardens provide financial and practical support, restoration, preservation, ongoing maintenance & further development of Bridge End Gardens, encouraging public knowledge, use and enjoyment of The Gardens amenity. Annually, February to December, Friends Volunteers meet weekly on Thursdays at 10.00hrs, undertaking gardening tasks. The Gardens complex have won many awards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 16 November 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Jean Vincent-Rogers | Chair | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jilly McNaughton | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alan Woods | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Caroline Hughes | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Skinner | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Inger Helena O'Meara | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES O'NEILL CMG | Trustee | 01 November 2000 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.74k | £3.30k | £6.94k | £1.84k | £2.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.63k | £763 | £2.37k | £4.30k | £921 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH FEBRUARY 2000, AS AMENDED 1ST NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
(1) TO RESTORE, PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THE GARDENS, KITCHEN GARDEN AND VICTORIAN MAZE EXTENDING TO APPROXIMATELY 1.4 HECTARES AND KNOWN AS BRIDGE END GARDENS AT SAFFRON WALDEN (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE HISTORY AND OTHER MATTERS RELATING TO BRIDGE END GARDENS.
Area of benefit
SAFFRON WALDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 MUSEUM STREET
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB10 1BN
- Phone:
- 01799 502021
- Email:
- john.bagley@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window