TERLING SWIMMING CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Terling Swimming Club Ltd, we have an open air swimming pool which the membership runs and maintains.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
Total income includes £14,096 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 12 May 2000: Standard registration
- TERLING SWIMMING CLUB LIMITED (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Hawthorn | Chair | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Neil Surman | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Long | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Webster | Trustee | 03 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stacie Surch | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Harrington | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donna Harrington | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lunn | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS POWELL POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.14k | £17.73k | £16.51k | £28.74k | £23.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.14k | £14.77k | £14.80k | £22.77k | £23.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.69k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 537 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 537 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 16 January 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 24TH MAY 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR THE INHABITANTS OF TERLING AND FAIRSTEAD AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE..
Area of benefit
TERLING AND FAIRSTEAD AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Speedwell Close
WITHAM
CM8 2XJ
- Phone:
- 07912117917
- Email:
- lhwebster@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window