Financial history INTERNATIONAL PENTECOSTAL COMMUNITY CHURCHES

Charity Number: 1085473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.20k £8.97k £11.04k £10.99k £13.55k
Total expenditure £9.50k £11.07k £10.76k £9.11k £10.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A