Trustees BUDLEIGH SALTERTON LADIES CHOIR

Charity number: 1080299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Margaret Blomeley Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Bernadette Isaac Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Deborah Reardan-Smith Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Maggy Cairns Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Fiona Clarke Treasurer Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Pamela Parsons Chair Trustee 08 March 2021
None on record
Linda Parker Secretary Trustee 03 May 2019
None on record
Ellen Singleton-Wood Trustee 03 May 2019
None on record
Andrea Cobban Trustee 06 September 2018
None on record