Financial history ETHNIC MINORITIES PARTNERSHIP AGENCY

Charity Number: 1084061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.75k £9.40k £4.80k £6.30k £8.40k
Total expenditure £17.20k £5.70k £1.71k £5.34k £6.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A