ETHNIC MINORITIES PARTNERSHIP AGENCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advocay and representation, Community engagement and involvement, Networking, Training and capacity building, Voice and Champion for the BAME interest
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Algeria
- Angola
- Benin
- Botswana
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Egypt
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 12 December 2000: Standard registration
- EMPA (Working name)
- ETHNIC MINORITIES PARTNERSHIP AGENCY (Working name)
- ETHNIC MINORITY PARTNERSHIP AGENCY (Working name)
- THE BARKING AND DAGENHAM ETHNIC MINORITY PARTNERSHIP AGENCY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERNARD GRAHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Josephine Amana | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
BASCO ABOR | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.75k | £9.40k | £4.80k | £6.30k | £8.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.20k | £5.70k | £1.71k | £5.34k | £6.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 24 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ASSOCIATE TOGETHER THE RELEVANT STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION IN THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC SERVICES ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, NATIONALITY, OR ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGINS, AND TO ENCOURAGE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10a Royal Parade
Church Street
Dagenham
RM10 9XB
- Phone:
- 02085937402
- Email:
- info@empa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window