Accounts and annual returns EAST OF ENGLAND ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity Number: 1081707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 21 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 21 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 09 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 09 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 08 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 12 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window