S1: ARTSPACE/PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
S1 Artspace's mission is to enable artists to achieve their ambitions through opportunities and resource, alongside a public programme that engages a broad audience both locally and internationally. Its purpose is to provide a focal point for the production, presentation and debate of contemporary art practice and support artist professional development through opportunities and collaboration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 08 November 2001: Standard registration
- S1 ARTSPACE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jonathan Bickle | Chair | 24 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Amy Louise Bedford | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
James O'Hara | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Mosley | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Niall Shamma | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.83k | £160.00k | £98.22k | £118.13k | £25.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £275.67k | £118.36k | £157.92k | £105.97k | £37.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £77.89k | £6.84k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 SEPTEMBER 1997 as amended on 16 May 2018 as amended on 27 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
To advance the education of the public in the appreciation and practice of the arts; and to assist artists in need through the provision of studio space and education in the arts.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Gilbert
South Street
Park Hill
SHEFFIELD
South Yorkshire
S2 5QY
- Phone:
- 0114 418 1191
- Email:
- info@s1artspace.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window