TIR COED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in woodland-related skills; and to develop, promote and encourage the provision of woodland-related facilities in the interests of health and social welfare, for the education and recreation of individuals in rural Wales who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, mental or physical disability, financial hardship or social circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £80,396 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 11 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEILA PETRONELLA KIERSCH | Chair | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Marcus | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie Gemmill | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meleri Elizabeth Evans | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Ann Ginley | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Lyn Prytherch | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH LYNN WILCOX BROOKE | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
GUY HAMILTON EVANS | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROGER THOMAS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221.93k | £490.03k | £405.59k | £596.12k | £399.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.14k | £351.29k | £400.48k | £556.50k | £491.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.87k | £10.41k | £80.71k | £80.40k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £533 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £544 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £594.98k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £54 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £542.41k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.50k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £586 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN WOODLAND-RELATED SKILLS; AND TO DEVELOP, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PROVISION OF WOODLAND-RELATED FACILITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR THE EDUCATION AND RECREATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN RURAL WALES WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 6 G The Science Park
Cefnllan
Llanbadarn
Aberystwyth
SY23 3AH
- Phone:
- 01970636909
- Email:
- finance@tircoed.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window