Financial history BANGOR NEW MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1126486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £19.66k £23.27k £26.84k £23.91k £29.16k
Total expenditure £17.90k £21.21k £25.89k £21.55k £32.35k
Income from government contracts N/A £8.95k £8.98k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.95k £8.98k N/A N/A