Accounts and annual returns FOURSQUARE CHURCH ANGELUS TEMPLE

Charity number: 1080126
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 August 2024 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 August 2024 287 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 November 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 November 2021 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window